VA SB1166 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0786)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0786)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clerks of court; collection of DNA sample for certain offenses; disclosure of tax information; Torrens system. Provides that a blood, saliva, or tissue sample shall be taken for any person convicted of a violation of a local ordinance that is similar to a misdemeanor for which a blood, saliva, or tissue sample is currently required to be taken. The bill also states that the prohibition for certain state and local officials from divulging tax information is not applicable to the disclosure of information contained in an estate's probate tax return to a commissioner of accounts making a settlement of accounts filed in such estate. Finally, the bill repeals the provision of law establishing the Torrens system, which provided for the settlement, registration, transfer, and assurance of titles to land and established courts of land registration.
Title
Clerks of court; collection of DNA sample for certain offenses, disclosure of tax information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0786) | |
2019-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 786 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1166ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103116D |