VA SB1174 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0623)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Tinting films; exemption for security canine handlers. Exempts vehicles operated in the performance of private security duties by a licensed security canine handler from limitations on window tinting. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tinting films; exemption for security canine handlers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0623)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 623 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1174ER)
2019-02-21SenateEnrolled
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseRead third time
2019-02-15HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseReported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 2-N)
2019-01-25HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-22SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16SenateReported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N)
2019-01-03SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-03SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101603D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621052(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback