VA SB1181 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0076)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Out-of-state conviction of drug offenses; restricted driver's license. Provides that a person convicted of a drug offense in another state may petition the general district court of the county or city in which he resides for a restricted driver's license allowing the petitioner to operate a motor vehicle in the Commonwealth on a restricted basis, provided that no such restricted license shall permit the petitioner to operate a commercial vehicle. This bill is identical to HB 1664.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Out-of-state conviction of drug offenses; person may petition for restricted driver's license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0076)
2019-02-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 76 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019
2019-02-14SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019
2019-02-13SenateSigned by President
2019-02-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-12SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1181ER)
2019-02-12SenateEnrolled
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseRead third time
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-07HouseReported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-22SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1181S1
2019-01-21SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105054D-S1
2019-01-21SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-21SenateRead second time
2019-01-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16SenateReported from Transportation with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16SenateIncorporates SB1536 (Surovell)
2019-01-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105054D-S1
2019-01-03SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-03SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100358D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462390.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback