VA SB1195 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0887)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0887)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Illegal gambling; definitions. Amends the definition of "illegal gambling" to clarify that the purchase of a product, Internet access, or other thing (i.e., phone card, movie rental vouchers), which purchase credits the purchaser with free points or other measurable units that may be risked by the purchaser for an opportunity to win money, is deemed consideration for the purposes of illegal gambling. The bill provides that but for the free points or other measurable units, the purchase of the product, Internet access, or other thing would be of insufficient value in and of itself to justify the purchase or is merely incidental to the chance to win money.
Title
Illegal gambling; amends definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED EMERGENCY (36-Y 61-N) (Y: 38 N: 61 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (26-Y 12-N 2-A) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (23-Y 12-N 2-A) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N 2-A) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 5-N 2-A) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (26-Y 12-N 2-A) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (23-Y 12-N 2-A) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N 2-A) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 5-N 2-A) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0887) | |
2011-04-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 887 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Communicated to Governor | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: REJECTED EMERGENCY (36-Y 61-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House rejected Governor's recommendation (36-Y 61-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (26-Y 12-N 2-A) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (23-Y 12-N 2-A) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1195ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Title replaced 11105441D-H1 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 2-A) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2011-02-23 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-22 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-22 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1195H1 | |
2011-02-22 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105441D-H1 | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-17 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105441D-H1 | |
2011-02-17 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N 2-A) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1195S1 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104800D-S1 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 5-N 2-A) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Incorporates SB1164 | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104800D-S1 | |
2011-01-13 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102434D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1195 (Similar To) 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0887)
HB1584 (Same As) 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0879)
HB1584 (Same As) 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0879)