VA SB1197 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0674)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0674)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pharmacies; freedom of choice. Requires carriers that provide exclusive provider policies and contracts to allow consumers freedom of choice for pharmacy benefits. This requirement currently applies to health insurers, health services plans, and health maintenance organizations in Virginia.
Title
Pharmacies; freedom of choice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0674) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 674 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1197ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102497D |