VA SB1205 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; definition of resident estate or trust. For income tax purposes, changes the definition of "resident estate or trust" to no longer include an estate or trust which is being administered in the Commonwealth. This bill is identical to HB 2526.
Title
Income tax, state; changes definition of resident estate or trust.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 192 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1205ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101508D |