VA SB1214 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0502)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0502)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School boards; local law-enforcement agencies; memorandums of understanding. Requires (i) the Virginia Center for School and Campus Safety to develop a model memorandum of understanding and (ii) the school board in each school division in which the local law-enforcement agency employs school resource officers to enter into a memorandum of understanding with such local law-enforcement agency that is based on such model and sets forth the powers and duties of the school resource officers. The bill requires each such school board and local law-enforcement agency to review and amend or affirm the memorandum at least once every five years or at any time upon the request of either party. This bill is identical to HB 1733.
Title
School boards; local law-enforcement agencies, memorandums of understanding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0502) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 502 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1214ER) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 19107492D-S2 |
2019-02-22 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-20 | House | Delegates: Gilbert, Landes, VanValkenburg |
2019-02-20 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senators: Newman, Locke, Carrico |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | House requested conference committee |
2019-02-18 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2019-02-15 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1214H1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106645D-H1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106645D-H1 |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1214S1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105805D-S1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Incorporates SB1563 (Lewis) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105805D-S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102333D |