VA SB1215 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0061)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0061)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School safety procedures; emergency situations; annual training. Requires each school board to develop training on safety procedures in the event of an emergency situation on school property. The bill requires such training to be delivered to each student and employee in each school at least once each school year. This bill is identical to HB 1732.
Title
School safety procedures; emergency situations, annual training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0061) | |
2019-02-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 61 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019 | |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1215ER) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-08 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1215S1 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19104489D-S1 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19104489D-S1 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102334D |