VA SB1217 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nursing homes; truth in advertising for inspections, surveys, and investigations. Requires that if inspection, survey, or investigation data is used in an advertisement regarding nursing homes, the advertisement also include the following information: (i) the date on which the survey, inspection, or investigation was conducted; (ii) a statement that the facility is required to submit a plan of correction in response to any and all statements of deficiencies; (iii) if a finding or deficiency cited in a statement of deficiencies has been corrected, a statement that the finding or deficiency has been corrected and the date on which the finding or deficiency was corrected; and (iv) a statement that the advertisement publication is not authorized or endorsed by the Virginia Department of Health, the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, the Office of the Inspector General, or any other governmental agency. The bill provides that failure to include this required information constitutes a violation of the Virginia Consumer Protection Act. The bill also requires that such information be in the same font, color, and size as the other text in the advertisement. This bill is identical to HB 2219.
Title
Nursing homes; truth in advertising for inspections, surveys, and investigations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N 1-A) (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N 1-A) (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 292 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1217ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N 1-A) |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed House with amendments (83-Y 15-N 1-A) |
2019-02-11 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-11 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-11 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (16-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102432D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 126 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 198 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |