VA SB122 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Teledentistry. Defines "teledentistry," establishes requirements for the practice of teledentistry and the taking of dental scans for use in teledentistry by dental scan technicians, and clarifies requirements related to the use of digital work orders for dental appliances in the practice of teledentistry.
Title
Teledentistry; definitions, establishes requirements for practice, digital scans, etc.
Sponsors
Sen. George Barker [D] | Sen. Bill DeSteph [R] | Sen. Mamie Locke [D] | Sen. Amanda Chase [R] |
Sen. Siobhan Dunnavant [R] | Sen. Joseph Morrissey [D] | Sen. Thomas Norment [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 220 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020 | |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB122ER) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB122S1 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106458D-S1 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106458D-S1 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Incorporates SB884 (DeSteph) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Incorporates SB210 (Locke) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103303D |
Same As/Similar To
SB210 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Incorporated by Education and Health
SB884 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Incorporated by Education and Health
HB165 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0037)
SB884 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Incorporated by Education and Health
HB165 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0037)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2708.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2708.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2719 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |