VA SB1224 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0857)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0857)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Temporary Assistance for Needy Families. Provides that the Department of Social Services is designated as the state agency responsible for coordinating state efforts related to supporting public agencies and charitable and community groups seeking to assist low-income Virginians in their efforts to become self-sufficient and establishes the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Fund to supplement the Department's administration of the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families block grant and assist the Commonwealth in maximizing program funds by leveraging individual, corporate, and charitable donations.
Title
TANF; establishes Fund, State to support agencies, etc., seeking to assist low-income Virginians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0857) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 857 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB1224ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Passed by temporarily | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2011-02-16 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1224ER) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-14 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-10 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Assigned Rehab sub: Social Services | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101515D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1608 (Same As) 2011-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)