VA SB1224 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0775)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Protective services; adult abuse, neglect, and exploitation; multidisciplinary teams. Authorizes local departments of social services to foster, when practicable, the creation, maintenance, and coordination of hospital and community-based multidisciplinary teams focused on the abuse, neglect, and exploitation of adults 60 years of age or older or 18 years of age or older who are physically or mentally incapacitated. The bill provides that such teams may: (i) assist the local department of social services in identifying abused, neglected, and exploited adults; (ii) coordinate medical, social, and legal services for abused, neglected, and exploited adults and their families; (iii) develop innovative programs for detection and prevention of the abuse, neglect, and exploitation of adults; (iv) promote community awareness and action to address adult abuse, neglect, and exploitation; and (v) disseminate information to the general public regarding the problem of adult abuse, neglect, and exploitation, strategies and methods for preventing such abuse, neglect, and exploitation and treatment options for abused, neglected, and exploited adults. The bill also allows the attorney for the Commonwealth in each jurisdiction to establish a multidisciplinary adult abuse, neglect, and exploitation response team to review cases of abuse, neglect, and exploitation of adults. Such multidisciplinary team may be established separately or in conjunction with any already existing multidisciplinary team. This bill is identical to HB 2560.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protective services; adult abuse and exploitation, multidisciplinary teams.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0775)
2019-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 775 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1224ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-21SenateTitle replaced 19106573D-H1
2019-02-21SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1224H1
2019-02-20HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106573D-H1
2019-02-20HousePassed by temporarily
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106573D-H1
2019-02-18HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-30SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1224S1
2019-01-29SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105183D-S1
2019-01-29SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-29SenateRead second time
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105183D-S1
2019-01-25SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateAssigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-04SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-04SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103368D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521627.6(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1224
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1224+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1224S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1224H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1224ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0775+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0032+SB1224
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0215SB1224+SB1224
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0243SB1224+SB1224
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0354+SB1224
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3141+SB1224
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0930SB1224+SB1224

Bill Comments

feedback