VA SB1229 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Housing and Community Development; amusement devices; trampoline courts. Directs the Board of Housing and Community Development to receive and consider regulations pertaining to the construction, maintenance, operation, and inspection of amusement devices known as trampoline courts pursuant to its current authority to regulate amusement devices.
Title
Housing and Community Development, Board of; amusement devices, trampoline courts.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in General Laws |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19101987D-E |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1229E |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (9-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101987D |