VA SB1231 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Incompetent defendants; capital murder. Provides that when a defendant charged with capital murder is determined to be unrestorably incompetent, the court may order that the defendant receive continued treatment to restore competency provided that hearings be held at yearly intervals for five years and at biennial intervals thereafter, or at any time that the director of the treating facility or his designee submits a competency report to the court that the defendant's competency has been restored. Under current law, hearings are held every six months for an incompetent defendant receiving treatment to restore competency. The bill also provides that no unrestorably incompetent defendant charged with capital murder shall be released except pursuant to a court order.
Title
Defendants; disposition of unrestorably incompetent, capital murder.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797) | |
2019-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 797 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1231ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Title replaced 19107277D-H1 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1231H1 |
2019-02-20 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19107277D-H1 |
2019-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-18 | House | Committee substitute printed 19107277D-H1 |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103597D |