VA SB1248 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0559)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0559)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local Stormwater Management Fund. Authorizes a locality by ordinance to create a local Stormwater Management Fund consisting of appropriated local moneys for the purpose of granting funds to an owner of private property or a common interest community for stormwater management and erosion prevention on previously developed lands. This bill is identical to HB 1614.
Title
Stormwater Management Fund, local; locality by ordinance authorized to create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0559) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 559 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1248ER) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Committee substitute rejected 19107083D-H1 |
2019-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee substitute printed 19107083D-H1 |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19102694D-E |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1248E |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1248E |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendment (12-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102694D |