VA SB1249 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0062)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0062)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Military families; relocation to the Commonwealth; student registration. Permits any student whose service member parent is relocated to the Commonwealth pursuant to orders received to register for courses and other academic programs and participate in the lottery process for charter schools and college partnership laboratory schools in the school division in which such student will reside at the same time and in the same manner as students who reside in the local school division. This bill is identical to HB 1623.
Title
Military families; relocation to the Commonwealth, student registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0062) | |
2019-02-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 62 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019 | |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1249ER) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-08 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19102697D-E |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1249E |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102697D |