VA SB1250 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration; absentee voting; prohibited changes to voter registration record. Prohibits changes to the registration record of a registered voter who has been sent or provided an absentee ballot from being put into effect until after the election for which he was sent or provided an absentee ballot. The changes are still processed when made or requested by the registered voter. The prohibition applies to registration transactions by electronic means. The bill requires the Department of Elections to provide instructions to the general registrars for enrolling the name and address of voters to whom an absentee ballot is sent or provided into the Virginia voter registration system and for checking the registration record to determine whether a registered voter has been sent or provided an absentee ballot when receiving a request for a change to the registration record.
Title
Voter registration; absentee voting, prohibited changes to voter registration record.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Engrossed by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Engrossed by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19103145D-E |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1250E |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (8-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103145D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 416.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 424 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |