VA SB1259 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Official designations; state first food. Designates the Virginia oyster (Crassostrea virginica) as the state first food of Virginia.
Title
Virginia oyster (Crassostrea virginica); designating as first food of Virginia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in General Laws |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100950D |