VA SB1263 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; trial as adult. Increases the minimum age that a juvenile can be tried as an adult in circuit court for a felony larceny offense from 14 years of age to 16 years of age.
Title
Juveniles; trial as an adult.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1263S1 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105673D-S1 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105673D-S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102938D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 241 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 249 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 269.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 269.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 270 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 284.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 285.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 299.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 309.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |