VA SB1269 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0645)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Length of school term; waiver for evacuation. Requires the Board of Education to waive the requirement that school divisions provide additional teaching days or teaching hours to compensate for school closings resulting from an evacuation directed and compelled by the Governor for up to five teaching days. The bill provides that there shall be no proportionate reduction in the amount paid by the Commonwealth from the Basic School Aid Fund or the amount paid by a local governing body. This bill is identical to HB 2124.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Length of school term; waiver for evacuation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (10-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0645)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 645 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1269ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-11HouseReported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenatePrinted as engrossed 19101597D-E
2019-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1269E
2019-02-04SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-04SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-04SenateRead second time
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReported from Education and Health with amendment (10-Y 3-N 1-A)
2019-01-09SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2019-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101597D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22198(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1269
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1269+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1269E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1269ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0645+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0141+SB1269
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0313SB1269+SB1269
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0355SB1269+SB1269
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0369SB1269+SB1269
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0126+SB1269
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2684+SB1269

Bill Comments

feedback