VA SB1270 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0801)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Real property tax exemption for disabled veterans; surviving spouses; ability to move to a different residence. Enacts as statutory law an amendment to subdivision (a) of Section 6-A of Article X of the Constitution of Virginia that was adopted by the voters on November 6, 2018, which applies the real property tax exemption for the surviving spouse of a disabled veteran to such spouse's principal place of residence regardless of whether such spouse moves to a different residence. The provisions of the bill would apply to taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2019. The bill makes technical corrections related to the real property tax exemptions for surviving spouses of members of the armed forces killed in action and surviving spouses of certain persons killed in the line of duty. This bill is identical to HB 1655.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real property tax; exemption for disabled veterans, surviving spouse's ability to move.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0801)
2019-03-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 801 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1270ER)
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled
2019-02-15SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with amendment (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-13HouseAmendment by Delegate Miyares agreed to
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-11HouseReported from Finance (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-22HouseRead first time
2019-01-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-18SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101186D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813219.14(n/a)See Bill Text
5813219.5(n/a)See Bill Text
5813219.9(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback