VA SB1277 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0792)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0792)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Wildlife exhibitor permit. Requires the Board of Game and Inland Fisheries to establish standards for the possession and display of wildlife by elementary and secondary school teachers for educational purposes. The bill exempts such exhibits from the wildlife exhibitor permit application and fee so long as the Department of Game and Inland Fisheries is notified of the display of wildlife and such display complies with the standards established by the Board.
Title
Wildlife exhibitor permit; possession and display of wildlife in schools for educational purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0792) | |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 792 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1277ER2) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2013-04-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 1-N) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1277ER) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-12 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2013-02-08 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House as amended SB1277 |
2013-02-08 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-02-08 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 13103043D |