VA SB1278 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; kindergarten instructional time. Increases from 540 hours to 990 hours the minimum instructional hours in a school year for students in kindergarten. The bill directs the Board of Education to promulgate regulations by July 1, 2021, establishing standards for accreditation that include a requirement that the standard school day for students in kindergarten average at least 5.5 instructional hours in order to qualify for full accreditation. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2021.
Title
Public schools; increases kindergarten instructional time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from Education (18-Y 4-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101549D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 253.13:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 79.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |