VA SB128 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0356)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0356)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
TNC partner vehicles; interior trade dress. Provides that transportation network company (TNC) partner vehicles may be equipped with certain removable illuminated interior trade dress devices that assist passengers in identifying and communicating with TNC partners. The bill limits the display and color of such illuminated interior trade dress devices and requires a TNC that issues such devices to file the specifications of the device with the Department of Motor Vehicles. This bill is identical to HB 830.
Title
TNC partner vehicles; interior trade dress.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0356) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 356 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB128ER) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB128S1 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106852D-S1 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106852D-S1 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2017-12-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-12-19 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101854D |