VA SB1286 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0658)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Persons with disabilities; auxiliary grants; supportive housing. Allows individuals receiving auxiliary grants to select supportive housing without any requirement that such individuals wait until their first or any subsequent annual reassessment to make such selection. The bill directs the Commissioner for Aging and Rehabilitative Services to (i) promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of the bill within 180 days of its enactment and (ii) develop guidance documents for implementation of the provisions of the bill no later than February 1, 2020. The bill establishes that the number of auxiliary grant recipients in the supportive housing setting shall not exceed 90 unless the waiting list for supportive housing consists of 30 individuals or more on October 1, 2020, in which case the maximum number of auxiliary grant recipients in supportive housing shall be increased to 120.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Auxiliary grants; supportive housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (1-Y 38-N) (Y: 1 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0658)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 658 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1286ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseConference report agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-20HouseDelegates: Peace, Orrock, Aird
2019-02-20HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-19SenateSenators: Barker, Cosgrove, Chafin
2019-02-19SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-19SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-18HouseHouse insisted on amendments
2019-02-15SenateHouse amendments rejected by Senate (1-Y 38-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-13HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-25SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102021D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
515160(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1286
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1286+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1286ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0658+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0041+SB1286
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0145+SB1286
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1286+SB1286
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0278SB1286+SB1286
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0155+SB1286
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2709+SB1286
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0681SB1286+SB1286
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0808SB1286+SB1286
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3269+SB1286
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1022SB1286+SB1286

Bill Comments

feedback