VA SB1293 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0779)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Uninsured motorist insurance coverage; settlement and release. Provides that any release executed as a result of a liability insurer settling a personal injury claim with an underinsured claimant for the available limits of the liability insurer's coverage shall not operate to release any parties other than the liability insurer and the underinsured motorist. The bill clarifies that neither a duty to defend nor an attorney-client relationship is created between the underinsured motorist and counsel for the underinsured motorist benefits insurer without the express intent and agreement of the underinsured motorist. The measure modifies the language in the written notice that is required to be provided to the underinsured motorist upon settlement to further clarify that no attorney-client relationship or duty to defend is created between the underinsured motorist and the underinsured motorist benefits insurer as a result of the settlement and release. The bill clarifies that by sending the notice and release to the underinsured motorist's last known address by certified mail, the liability insurer satisfies the requirement of having the underinsured motorist sign the release and initial the notice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uninsured motorist insurance coverage; settlement and release.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0779)
2019-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 779 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1293ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (19-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-25SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102892D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3822206(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1293
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1293+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1293ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0779+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0055+SB1293
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0151SB1293+SB1293
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0178SB1293+SB1293
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0179SB1293+SB1293
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0180SB1293+SB1293
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0182+SB1293
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2710+SB1293

Bill Comments

feedback