VA SB1296 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0403)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0403)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Potomac River Bridge Towing Compact. Adds the Harry W. Nice Bridge, Sandy Hook Bridge, Brunswick Bridge, and Point of Rocks Bridge to the Potomac River bridges subject to the Potomac River Bridge Towing Compact to facilitate the prompt and orderly removal of disabled and abandoned vehicles from the bridges by giving the District of Columbia, Maryland, and Virginia appropriate authority anywhere on the bridges. This amendment to the Compact shall not become effective until a substantially similar amendment is enacted by the State of Maryland and the District of Columbia, as provided for in the Compact.
Title
Potomac River Bridge Towing Compact; adds several bridges to Compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0403) | |
2019-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 403 (effective - see bill) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1296ER) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-18 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred from Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19102225D-E |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1296E |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Transportation |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102225D |