VA SB1298 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0232)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0232)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alternative education programs; data. Requires the Department of Education to annually collect from each school board and publish on its website various enrollment and achievement data on alternative education programs for students who have been suspended, expelled, or otherwise precluded from attendance at school. The bill requires such data to be published in a manner that protects the identities of individual students and disaggregated by local school division and by student race, ethnicity, gender, and disability. This bill is identical to HB 1985.
Title
Alternative education programs; Department of Education to annually collect data on programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0232) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 232 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1298ER) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-12 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-08 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-08 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102732D |