VA SB1300 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0066)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0066)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Funeral establishments; full-time manager requirement; exception; number of calls. Provides that the Board of Funeral Services may grant a hardship waiver from the requirement that each licensed funeral service establishment have a person licensed for the practice of funeral services or a licensed funeral director in charge, full time, allowing for the operation of two establishments by a single full-time funeral service licensee or funeral director if the combined average number of funeral calls at the two establishments over the previous three years is no more than 135 calls per year and the distance between the two establishments is 50 miles or less. Currently, the Board may grant the exception if the combined average number of annual calls at the two establishments is no more than 85 per year.
Title
Funeral establishments; full time manager requirement, exception, number of calls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0066) | |
2019-02-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 66 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019 | |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1300ER) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102369D |