VA SB1301 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0774)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0774)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Use of unmanned aircraft systems by public bodies; search warrant required. Replaces the moratorium currently set to expire on July 1, 2015, on the use of unmanned aircraft systems by state and local law-enforcement and regulatory entities, except in defined emergency situations or in training exercises related to such situations, with an absolute prohibition on the use of unmanned aircraft systems by such law-enforcement and regulatory entities unless a search warrant has been obtained prior to such use. The warrant requirement does not apply to (i) utilization of such systems to support the Commonwealth for purposes other than law enforcement; (ii) certain search and rescue operations; (iii) certain Virginia National Guard and United States Armed Forces functions; (iv) research and development conducted by institutions of higher education or other research organizations; or (v) the use of unmanned aircraft systems for private, commercial, or recreational use.
Title
Unmanned aircraft systems; use by public bodies during execution of a search warrant, exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #3 (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation #3 agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #3 (17-Y 22-N) (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendations #1,#2,#4 (12-Y 27-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation #3 agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #3 (17-Y 22-N) (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendations #1,#2,#4 (12-Y 27-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0774) | |
2015-04-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 774 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Communicated to Governor |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #3 (17-Y 23-N) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation #3 agreed to (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #3 (17-Y 22-N) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendations #1,#2,#4 (12-Y 27-N 1-A) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1301ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Title replaced 15105072D-H1 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | House substitute with amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Passed House with substitute with amendments (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments SB1301H1 |
2015-02-24 | House | Amendments by Delegate Cline agreed to |
2015-02-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105072D-H1 |
2015-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-13 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105072D-H1 |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 17-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1301S1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104945D-S1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104945D-S1 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102937D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 287.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 60.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 60.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |