VA SB1304 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0036)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0036)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designating the Trooper Garland Matthew Miller Memorial Bridge. Designates the Barlow Road overpass that crosses Interstate 64 in York County the "Trooper Garland Matthew Miller Memorial Bridge."
Title
Trooper Garland Matthew Miller Memorial Bridge; designating as Barlow Road overpass over I 64.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0036) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 36 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Friday, February 27, 2015 | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/20/15 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1304ER) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102724D |