VA SB1304 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0713)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Smoking in outdoor amphitheater or concert venue; civil penalty. Authorizes any locality, by ordinance, to designate reasonable no-smoking areas within an outdoor amphitheater or concert venue owned by the locality. The bill requires such ordinance to (i) require adequate signage designating such areas, (ii) provide that a violation of such ordinance is subject to a civil penalty of not more than $25 to be paid into the treasury of the locality where the offense occurred and expended solely for public health purposes, and (iii) provide that any law-enforcement officer may issue a summons regarding a violation of the ordinance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Smoking in outdoor amphitheater or concert venue; civil penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0713)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 713 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1304ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-21SenateRead third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N)
2019-01-18SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15SenateReported from Local Government (10-Y 3-N)
2019-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2019-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102387D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152926.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1304
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1304+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1304ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0713+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S07V0011+SB1304
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0062SB1304+SB1304
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0104SB1304+SB1304
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1103V0020+SB1304
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1103V0029+SB1304
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0256+SB1304
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2940+SB1304
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2983+SB1304

Bill Comments

feedback