VA SB1307 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Transfers to Minors Act; age 25. Permits a transferor to transfer property under the Uniform Transfers to Minors Act to an individual under the age of 21 to be paid, conveyed, or transferred to such individual upon his attaining 25 years of age, unless the minor attaining age 21 years of age delivers a written request therefor to the custodian. Under current law, such property must be paid, conveyed, or transferred upon the individual's attaining 18 years of age, or 21 years of age if specifically requested by the custodian.
Title
Uniform Transfers to Minors Act; transfer of property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 527 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1307ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102479D |