VA SB1309 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0755)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0755)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charitable Gaming Board; membership. Increases the total number of members of the Charitable Gaming Board from nine to eleven and transfers from the Governor to the General Assembly the authority to appoint five of the eleven members. Of the five members appointed by the General Assembly, three will be appointed by the Speaker of the House and two will be appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules. The bill also provides the qualifications for the new appointees of the Governor and the General Assembly and establishes the order in which such appointments shall be made.
Title
Charitable Gaming Board; membership.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 37-N) (Y: 0 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 2-N) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 37-N) (Y: 0 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 2-N) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0755) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 755 (effective 7/1/15) |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1309ER2) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1309ER) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2015-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 15105412D-S2 |
2015-02-23 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-18 | House | Delegates: Anderson, Knight, Spruill |
2015-02-18 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senators: Ruff, Reeves, Barker |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | House requested conference committee |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | House insisted on amendments (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 37-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (94-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed House with amendments (94-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2015-02-18 | House | Amendments by Delegate Jones agreed to |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2015-02-18 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed House (90-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | House | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1309S1 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104593D-S1 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104593D-S1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103328D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 340.15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.23 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.24 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.26:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.27 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.31 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.33 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.36 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2455 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2456 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2456.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2456.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |