VA SB1309 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1309
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Local stormwater assistance; flood mitigation and protection. Authorizes grants from a local Stormwater Management Fund to be used for flood mitigation and protection measures that are part of a comprehensive flood mitigation and protection plan adopted by the locality, and requires such grants, where practicable, to prioritize projects that include nature-based practices. Current law allows such funds to be used only for the construction, improvement, or repair of a stormwater management facility or for erosion and sediment control. Local stormwater assistance; flood mitigation and protection. Authorizes grants from a local Stormwater Management Fund to be used for flood mitigation and protection measures that are part of a comprehensive flood mitigation and protection plan adopted by the locality, and requires such grants, where practicable, to prioritize projects that include nature-based practices. Current law allows such funds to be used only for the construction, improvement, or repair of a stormwater management facility or for erosion and sediment control.
Title
Local stormwater assistance; flood mitigation and protection.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1309S1 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103219D-S1 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103219D-S1 |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102847D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1309 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote