VA SB1314 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0173)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0173)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certain facilities in the Commonwealth; participation in educational programs. Requires any person of school age who is admitted to the Commonwealth Center for Children and Adolescents to be permitted to participate in any education program offered in the facility that is administered by the Department of Education, regardless of his enrollment status, unless such person has been excused from attendance at school due to a bona fide religious training or belief. The bill permits information required to enroll such person in any such education program to be disclosed in accordance with state and federal law. This bill is identical to HB 1986.
Title
Children in residence or custody; participation in educational programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0173) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 173 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1314ER) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Title replaced 19106359D-H1 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1314H1 |
2019-02-08 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106359D-H1 |
2019-02-08 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106359D-H1 |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101466D |