VA SB1325 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0595)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0595)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; mixed beverage licenses for certain properties. Increases from 1,500 feet to 3,000 feet the distance from Interstate 81 within which the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board may grant mixed beverage licenses to establishments located on property on either frontage road between mile markers 75 and 86 in the County of Wythe.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; mixed beverage licenses for certain properties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 12-N) (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0595) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 595 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1325ER) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 12-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed House (84-Y 12-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102583D |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverage Control Act
Counties Cities and Towns
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Interstate Route 81
Mixed Beverages Alcoholic
Wythe County
Counties Cities and Towns
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Interstate Route 81
Mixed Beverages Alcoholic
Wythe County