VA SB1328 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Stormwater Local Assistance Fund; grants to non-MS4 localities. Authorizes the Department of Environmental Quality (the Department), with the approval of the Secretary of Natural Resources, to designate a portion of the moneys appropriated to the Stormwater Local Assistance Fund for fiscal year 2020 and any subsequent fiscal year, in an amount no greater than 20 percent of the appropriated amount, to provide matching grants to local governments that are not regulated under municipal separate storm sewer system (MS4) permits for the planning, design, and implementation of stormwater best management practices. The bill directs the Department to prioritize grants for projects that are regional in scope. The bill requires any designated moneys remaining after the Department has completed its annual solicitation of grant applications and made related authorization decisions for projects proposed by non-MS4 localities to be available for authorization by the Department to additional projects of MS4 localities. The bill directs the Department to seek stakeholder input and public comment in developing eligibility criteria and to submit such criteria by January 1, 2020, for consideration by the State Water Control Board.
Title
Stormwater Local Assistance Fund; grants to non-MS4 localities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19103935D-E |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1328E |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103935D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 44.15:29.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |