VA SB1329 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0606)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Major information technology project procurement; terms and conditions; limitation of liability provisions. Requires, in any contract for a major information technology project, terms and conditions relating to the indemnification obligations and liability of a supplier to be reasonable and to not exceed in aggregate twice the value of the contract. The bill also provides that there is be no limitation on the liability of a supplier for (i) any intentional or willful misconduct, fraud, or recklessness of a supplier or any employee of a supplier or (ii) claims for bodily injury, including death, and damage to real property or tangible personal property resulting from the negligence of a supplier or any employee of a supplier. The bill provides an exception to such conditions where the Secretary of Administration approves a reasonable maximum alternative limitation of liability amount recommended by the Chief Information Officer of the Commonwealth based on a risk assessment showing exceptional risk to the Commonwealth. This bill is identical to HB 2324.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Major information technology project procurement; terms and conditions, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0606)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 606 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1329ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-02-11HouseReferred from Science and Technology by voice vote
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Science and Technology
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1329S1
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105365D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-31SenateRead second time
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateReported from Finance (14-Y 2-N)
2019-01-21SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-21SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105365D-S1
2019-01-21SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
2019-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103342D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222012.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1329
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1329+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1329S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1329ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0606+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0039+SB1329
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0154+SB1329
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1329+SB1329
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0287SB1329+SB1329
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0251+SB1329
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2942+SB1329
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2985+SB1329

Bill Comments

feedback