VA SB1333 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0077)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0077)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle dealers and manufacturers; franchises; transfer or discontinuation of manufacturing rights. Provides that if a motor vehicle manufacturer or factory branch discontinues, sells, or transfers its right to manufacture a line-make of motor vehicles, and the acquiring manufacturer or factory branch does not honor an existing franchise agreement with motor vehicle dealers in Virginia, such discontinuation, sale, or transfer shall constitute a termination of the franchise and such motor vehicle dealers shall be entitled to compensation pursuant to Virginia law.
Title
Motor vehicle dealers and manufacturers; transfer or discontinuation of manufacturing rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0077) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 77 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019 | |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1333ER) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1333S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105506D-S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105506D-S1 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101321D |