VA SB1340 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Land preservation tax credits; threshold for conservation value review by Department of Conservation and Recreation. Lowers the threshold from $1 million to $500,000 for (i) conservation value review of land preservation tax credit applications by the Department of Conservation and Recreation and (ii) requiring a copy of the tax credit application to be filed with the Department of Conservation and Recreation.
Title
Land preservation tax credits; threshold for conservation value review by DCR, lowers the threshold.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 7-N) (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Finance |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 7-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Finance (13-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102211D |