VA SB1341 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0262)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0262)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Eastern Virginia Groundwater Management Advisory Committee established. Establishes the Eastern Virginia Groundwater Management Advisory Committee (the Committee) to assist the Department of Environmental Quality (DEQ) in developing, revising, and implementing a management strategy for ground water in the Eastern Virginia Groundwater Management Area. The bill prohibits the State Water Control Board and the DEQ from issuing draft permits that would require reductions in the volume of permitted ground water withdrawals prior to December 31, 2015, unless otherwise agreed by the permittee. The bill has a sunset date of January 1, 2018.
Title
Eastern Virginia Groundwater Management Advisory Committee; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0262) | |
2015-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 262 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1341ER) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-20 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed House (94-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1341S1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104507D-S1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104507D-S1 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15103746D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1924 (Same As) 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0613)