VA SB1341 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Use of handheld personal communications devices while driving. Prohibits any person from holding a handheld personal communications device while driving a motor vehicle. Current law prohibits only the reading of any email or text message and manually entering letters or text in such a device as a means of communicating. The bill expands the exemptions to include handheld personal communications devices that are being held and used (i) as an amateur radio or a citizens band radio or (ii) for official Department of Transportation or traffic incident management services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Handheld personal communications devices; prohibition on holding while driving.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (40-Y 52-N) (Y: 40 N: 52 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N) (Y: 4 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 29-N) (Y: 70 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 4-N) (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-24SenateFailed to pass in Senate
2019-02-24SenateNo further action taken
2019-02-23HouseDelegates: Collins, Bell, Robert B., Bourne
2019-02-23HouseSecond conferees appointed by House
2019-02-23HouseHouse requested second conference committee
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: REJECTED (40-Y 52-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report rejected by House (40-Y 52-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference substitute printed 19107730D-S2
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
2019-02-23SenateReconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 2-N)
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Collins, Bell, Robert B., Bourne
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Stuart, Chafin, Obenshain
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21SenateSenate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-21HouseHouse insisted on amendment
2019-02-21SenateHouse amendment rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N)
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 29-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House with amendment (70-Y 29-N)
2019-02-20HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-20HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 4-N)
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
2019-02-04SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1341S1
2019-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106056D-S1
2019-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-04SenateRead second time
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106056D-S1
2019-01-30SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
2019-01-23SenateRereferred to Courts of Justice
2019-01-23SenateRereferred from Transportation (11-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104282D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621078.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1341
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1341+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1341S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1341S2+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S11V0029+SB1341
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0190+SB1341
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0313SB1341+SB1341
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0355SB1341+SB1341
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0404SB1341+SB1341
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0139+SB1341
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0361+SB1341
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3144+SB1341
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0934SB1341+SB1341
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0998SB1341+SB1341
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3367+SB1341
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1109SB1341+SB1341
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1111SB1341+SB1341
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1112SB1341+SB1341

Bill Comments

feedback