VA SB1343 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to overide veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to overide veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Fairfax. Increases the maximum transient occupancy tax that the city may levy from four percent to six percent. Any amount above four percent shall be placed into an economic development opportunity fund to be used solely for economic development, marketing, or tourism initiatives.
Title
Charter; City of Fairfax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 31-N) (Y: 68 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 31-N) (Y: 68 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | Requires 27 affirmative votes to overide veto |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto (21-Y 19-N) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-25 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1343ER) |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 31-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed House (68-Y 31-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (16-Y 5-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) |
2013-02-11 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #1 |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (11-Y 3-N) |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 13103850D |