VA SB1346 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0625)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Electric cooperatives; rates. Authorizes any electric cooperative to (i) if it does not hold a membership interest in a utility aggregation cooperative, petition the Commission for approval of one or more rate adjustment clauses for the timely and current recovery from customers of the costs of generation facilities, modifications to generation facilities, or pumped hydroelectricity generation and storage facilities or (ii) adopt any other cooperative's voluntary rate, voluntary program, or voluntary tariff.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric cooperatives; rates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0625)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 625 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1346ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 4-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House (95-Y 4-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House (94-Y 4-N)
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HousePassed by temporarily
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 2-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1346S1
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105950D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-31SenateRead second time
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105950D-S1
2019-01-28SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104214D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1346
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1346+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1346S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1346ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0625+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0073+SB1346
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1346+SB1346
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0278SB1346+SB1346
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0189+SB1346
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3035+SB1346
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3036+SB1346

Bill Comments

feedback