VA SB1350 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration; cancellation of registration. Allows a voter to cancel his registration by notifying the Department of Elections through electronic means of his request to have his name removed from the registration records. The bill also allows the State Board of Elections to use commercially available sources to identify voters whose addresses may have changed. The bill further requires the general registrars to cancel the registration of any voter for whom the registrar receives a notice in accordance with the Driver License Compact that the voter has moved from the Commonwealth.
Title
Voter registration; cancellation of registration by notifying Dept. of Elections to remove his name.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (15-Y 25-N) (Y: 15 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Communicated to Governor |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (15-Y 25-N) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1350ER) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1350S1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104259D-S1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104259D-S1 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to P&E sub: Elections |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15103121D |
Same As/Similar To
SB711 (Similar To) 2015-02-09 - Failed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (7-Y 7-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 427 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 428 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |