VA SB1355 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local planning commission; action on proposed plat. Applies certain provisions, including a 60-day time limit, to the process of approval by any local planning commission of a plat or site plan that solely involves commercial real estate. Currently, the provisions apply only to planning commissions in localities with a population greater than 90,000 based on the 2000 United States Census. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Local planning commission; action on proposed plat.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 82 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 420 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/25/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1355ER) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed House (80-Y 19-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (14-Y 7-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15103176D |