VA SB1355 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0651)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Coal combustion residuals impoundment; closure. Requires the owner or operator of any coal combustion residuals (CCR) unit, defined in the bill to include a coal ash pond or landfill, within the Chesapeake Bay watershed at Bremo Power Station, Chesapeake Energy Center, Chesterfield Power Station, and Possum Point Power Station to close such CCR unit by removing all of the CCR for (i) recycling, known as encapsulated beneficial use, or (ii) deposition in a permitted and lined landfill that meets certain federal standards. The measure requires that any owner or operator beneficially reuse no less than 6.8 million cubic yards in aggregate of such removed CCR from no fewer than two of the sites. Such a closure project shall be completed within 15 years of its initiation and shall be accompanied by an offer by the owner or operator to provide connection to a municipal water supply for every residence within one-half mile, or if such connection is not feasible, the owner or operator shall offer to provide water testing for any such residence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coal combustion residuals impoundment; closure of certain CCR units.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 2-N) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 19106258D-S2 (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Pending question ordered (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0651)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 651 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 25, 2019
2019-02-19SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1355ER)
2019-02-19SenateEnrolled
2019-02-15HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 2-N)
2019-02-15HousePassed House (93-Y 2-N)
2019-02-15HouseRead third time
2019-02-14HouseRead second time
2019-02-13HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (37-Y 2-N 1-A)
2019-02-05SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2019-02-04SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenatePrinted as engrossed 19106258D-ES2
2019-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1355ES2
2019-02-04SenateTitle replaced 19106258D-S2
2019-02-04SenateAmendment by Senator Chase agreed to
2019-02-04SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-01SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-01SenateAmendments by Senator Wagner agreed to
2019-02-01SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-01SenateSubstitute by Senator Stuart ruled out of order 19106346D-S3
2019-02-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106258D-S2 (28-Y 12-N)
2019-02-01SenatePending question ordered (24-Y 16-N)
2019-02-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-01SenateCommittee substitute rejected 19105979D-S1
2019-02-01SenateRead second time
2019-02-01SenateFloor substitute printed 19106346D-S3 (Stuart)
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateIncorporates SB1533 (Surovell)
2019-01-30SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106258D-S2
2019-01-30SenateReported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N 2-A)
2019-01-28SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-28SenateIncorporates SB1534 (Surovell)
2019-01-28SenateIncorporates SB1009 (Chase)
2019-01-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105979D-S1
2019-01-28SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-01-23SenateAssigned C&L sub: Coal Ash Subcommittee
2019-01-17SenateRereferred to Commerce and Labor
2019-01-17SenateRereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 1-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103057D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1355
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1355+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1355S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1355S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1355S3+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1355ES2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1355ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0651+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S01V0010+SB1355
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0076+SB1355
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0175+SB1355
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0268SB1355+SB1355
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0311SB1355+SB1355
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0312SB1355+SB1355
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0355SB1355+SB1355
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0402SB1355+SB1355
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0412SB1355+SB1355
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0413SB1355+SB1355
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0084+SB1355
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2870+SB1355

Bill Comments

feedback