VA SB1359 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0863)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0863)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance premiums tax; retaliatory costs tax credit. Enhances the retaliatory tax credit for the insurance premiums tax by increasing the amount of the refund for certain taxpayers receiving the credit in 2000, beginning in taxable year 2011, from a maximum of $800,000 annually to $7 million annually.
Title
Insurance premiums tax; retaliatory costs tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0863) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 863 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB1359ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-21 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1359ER) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Passed House (95-Y 2-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Amendment by Delegate Morrissey rejected | |
2011-02-16 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-14 | House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11103423D-E | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1359E | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103423D |