VA SB1365 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0808)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0808)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education Improvement Scholarships tax credits; benefits Education Improvement Scholarships tax credits; benefits and eligibility requirements; eligible students with a disability. Increases the scholarship amount available for an eligible student with a disability from 100 percent to 300 percent of the per pupil amount distributed to the local school division as the state's share of the standards of quality costs, or the actual qualified educational expenses of the student, whichever is less. The bill broadens the definition of "eligible student with a disability" to include any child who is a resident of Virginia for whom an Individualized Education Plan (IEP) has been written and finalized in accordance with the federal Individuals with Disabilities Education Act (IDEA). In addition, the family household income of the eligible student with a disability who is receiving the scholarship must not exceed 400 percent of the
Title
Education Improvement Scholarships tax credits; benefits and eligibility requirements, provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (23-Y 15-N) (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (52-Y 45-N) (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (52-Y 45-N) (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0808) | |
2019-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 808 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1365ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (23-Y 15-N) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (52-Y 45-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House with amendment (52-Y 45-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment (10-Y 9-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance (11-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101348D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 439.25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.28 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |